Mathematics

2129 Followers - 222 Articles - 362 Questions and Answers

Question: 
Vedic maths tricks

Avatar
Asked by zwitten

My dear friends,

try to do some simple calculations given below within a second…

1)83 multiplied by 87 2)24 multiplied by26 3)72 multiplied by 78 4)99 multiplied by 91 5) 65 multiplied by 65

Tell me how much time did you take to solve them correctly. Let me analyze your reply & then I'll tell you the trick to calculate it within a second!

If you know already don't disclose it here, send me a message.


Question_answered

90 Comments
    oLahav
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Oren LahavMon, 14 Jul 2008 14:05:06 -0000

    That's a great trick! I'll use this for sure next time I have to take a test with no calculators allowed, thanks!

    Post Comments

    jlj2783
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    abhishek jalajMon, 13 Aug 2012 19:01:07 -0000

    is this trick will b apply on digits like 14*14, 25*25 can u tell me

    Reply to This
    zwitten
    Vote
    Current Rating
    -2
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    GOURAV BHOMAJMon, 14 Jul 2008 21:08:05 -0000

    this is the trick exclusively applicable to the multiplications of 2 numbers whose digits at unit's place add up to 10 as well as whose digits at tenth's place are same. both of these conditions should be satisfied.

    e.g.1)in product of 83 & 87, digit at tenth's place is same i.e.8 & sum of 3 & 7 is 10.

    now, follow the rules--

    a)firstly, find product of digits at unit's places i.e. here 3 * 7=21.

    b)secondly, multiply tenth's place digit by next consecutive number i.e. here 8 * 9=72.

    c)now your answer is the outcome in second step i.e.72 followed by outcome in first stepi.e.21

    d) hence, your answer is 7221.

    In example 3, answer is 7 * 8=56 followed by 2 * 8=16 i.e. 5616.

    You should take care that when digits at unit's places are 1 & 9, you must write their product as 09.

    considering example 4, answer is 9 * 10=90 followed by 9 * 1=09 i.e. 9009.

    now, you can do such specific multiplications orally within a second!

    Post Comments

    ARRBBIN
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    ARABINDA KUMAR MOHANTASun, 19 Jul 2009 19:13:28 -0000
    83*87=85*85-4=7225-4=7221
    mathswild
    Rating
    6
    Rate Up
    mathswildThu, 17 Jun 2010 14:14:59 -0000

    to find the squares of two and three digit no
    i have an easy method follow
    87*87 (100-87)=(13)13*13=169
    87-13=74
    74
    +169
    --
    7569

    bhanuabhiram
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    bhanuabhiramWed, 22 Sep 2010 04:03:30 -0000

    finding the square of two digit numbers is simply superb and easy.. telll me how to find the squares of 3 digit numbers and the square root of the big numbers with decimal points.i m waiting for ur reply

    aalekhjn
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    aalekhjnSat, 04 Jun 2011 11:29:42 -0000
    i take 3 mins
    manaswini_math
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    manaswini_mathWed, 23 Nov 2011 11:33:58 -0000

    bt how 2 do if we have 2 find 69*69

    career_green
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    career_greenSun, 12 Aug 2012 15:40:39 -0000

    this is awesome

    Reply to This
    Peter Blomert
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Peter BlomertMon, 14 Jul 2008 21:19:07 -0000

    Here is the math behind that wonderful trick:

    (10x + y)(10x + 10 - y)=100x2 100x - 10xy +10xy +10y -y2 = 100x2 +100x + 10y - y2 = 10x * 10(x1) + (10-y) * y

    Post Comments

    vani87
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    vani87Sun, 28 Nov 2010 04:06:55 -0000

    Will you please explain that trick sir?

    aditi_mishra15
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    aditi_mishra15Wed, 06 Apr 2011 07:34:33 -0000

    plz explain this trick i.i m not getting it

    Ananda_KMR
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Ananda_KMRTue, 05 Jul 2011 04:09:33 -0000

    has anyone understood thi trick ?
    I took 'xy' as two digit number but it wont give you the correct result.Say for example 72, so x=7 and y=2 of we substitute the values there it gvies the result of 72*78

    Proof : (10x + y)(10x + 10 - y)
    (10*7+2)(10*7+10-2)=72*78…..?

    have I mistook the trick…please let me know.

    Thanks in advance

    love nature
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    love nature Thu, 14 Feb 2013 08:38:41 -0000

    i have some tricks in maths
    TO FIND A SQUARE OF ANY NUMBER-
    let's find square of 12
    first identify nearest number like 10 20 30 40 50 …
    here it is 10
    12-10 is 2 add 12to 2=14 aand multiply by 1 now square the last digit of 12that is (2)square=4 so your answer is 144

    lets find square of 16
    16-10=6
    16+6=22
    and square of 6=36
    so answer is 22
    36
    =256
    you can do it by 20 also
    20-16=4
    now i have to subtract 4 from 16 =12and multiply 12 by 2 since i have chosen 20 whose first digit is 2; in case of 10 it was 1 so it was of no problem
    so 12*2=24and 6square is 36
    so answer is 24
    16
    =256
    in short, for 12 +it's last digit '2' =14
    and 2square =4
    answer=144

    lets try of say 63
    63+6=69
    69*6=414and square of 3=09
    so answer =4149
    this trick apply to all in case a 3 digit no. 112 lets say
    112+2=114
    114*11(first two digit's of 110 are 11)
    =1254
    and square of 2=04
    so answer is 12544

    for squares of no. containing last digit 5
    example 25
    sqaure 5=25 which remains as it is in all cases for finding squares of 25,35,55,75,65,…..
    and multiply first digit by it's following digit
    2*(2+1)=2*3=6
    answer=625
    let's find square of 65
    6*7=42
    answer=4225(last '25' in all cases)

    this is a separate trick for multiplying nos. containing equal no. of digits but one number must contains all 9's
    for example
    23*99
    write 23 as it is and subtract 1 from last digit that is 3.=3-1= 2 now subtract 2 and 3 separatly from 9
    =9-2 and 9-3
    =7and 6
    so answer is 2(3-1)76
    =2276
    now add 1 to it final answer=2277
    let' multiply
    794*999
    answer is 79(4-1)(9-7)(9-9)(9-4)
    =793205
    now add 1 to it =793206

    one more example 654789*999999
    i m writing final answer you try using same trick
    65478(9-1)34521(0+1)
    =654788345211
    in first bracket "last digit -1"
    and in second bracket 'last digit +1"
    i also know to find square roots of perfect squares numbers for example 25 625 169 576 … any number . if you want to learn email me in june i am free

    Reply to This
    zwitten
    Vote
    Current Rating
    -4
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    GOURAV BHOMAJMon, 14 Jul 2008 21:31:03 -0000

    Oh that's awesome! Sir, you're great, indeed!! You've put that trick in mathematical language within a few minutes!!!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Peter Blomert
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Peter BlomertMon, 14 Jul 2008 21:34:22 -0000

    You showed me what to look for - after that it was simple.

    Post Comments

    dishu123
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    dishu nThu, 04 Feb 2010 05:33:46 -0000

    it was good

    Reply to This
    deeapk_dhanuka
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    deepak_dhanukaFri, 16 Jan 2009 14:14:14 -0000

    Thanks to both of u sir for the great disscussion..

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    cdchaitanya
    Vote
    Current Rating
    3
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    ChaitTue, 14 Jul 2009 21:05:59 -0000

    83 * 87 = Multiply last and first digit ( 3*8 = 24) , Multiply First & First Digit ( 8*8 = 64 ), Multiply Last & last digit (3*7 = 21), Multiply First & last digit ( 8*7 =56)

    64 & 21 if joined - 6421

    Add at exact location

    24

    6421
    56
    ----
    7221

    Post Comments

    safndn
    Rating
    2
    Rate Up
    kSun, 06 Sep 2009 17:10:49 -0000

    83*87=step-1 unit digit(3*7)=21 in right side & tens digit (8*9(8+1))=72 thenanswer is 7221

    savu_hd14
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Thu, 19 May 2011 09:34:28 -0000

    In this case its true. bt its not working in other cases U try some more examples on this method then u get properly . its not working as ur trick. thank u

    Reply to This
    jken
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    jennifer kenFri, 14 Aug 2009 16:58:57 -0000

    these mrthods are very smart!!!!!!!!!!!!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    reetika0909
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Reetika dhawanWed, 02 Sep 2009 04:39:00 -0000

    what about this When you multiply two numbers in the 90's together, in parenthesis next to each number put how far that number is away from 100. Since 92 is 8 away from 100 and 94 is 6 away from 100, the problem 92 × 94 would look like this: 92(8) x 94(6)
    Example: 93(7) x 96(4)
    Step 1: Add up the numbers in parenthesis 7 + 4 = 11 and subtract that number from 100. 100 - 11 = 89
    Step 2: Multiply the two numbers in parenthesis together and tack that on to the number from Step 1. 7 × 4 = 28
    Answer: 93 × 96 = 8928

    Post Comments

    ritu aggarwal
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    ritu aggarwalWed, 28 Sep 2011 16:21:00 -0000

    i like this method
    bt can u tell me whn we multiply an even no or odd no,even or even no & odd or odd no thn those logic will be put there?

    Reply to This
    safndn
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kSun, 06 Sep 2009 17:12:12 -0000

    8387=step-1 unit digit(37)=21 in right side & tens digit (8*9(8+1))=72 thenanswer is 7221

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Sreeju_unni
    Vote
    Current Rating
    2
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    SreejuWed, 23 Sep 2009 09:01:37 -0000

    83*87
    3*7=21
    8(8+1)=72

    Post Comments

    subhajit das
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    subhajit dasMon, 18 Apr 2011 07:20:02 -0000
    Reply to This
    carishma
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    KammaSun, 08 Nov 2009 11:30:22 -0000

    One more simple trick!

    83 x 87

    1) find out 100 - 83=17
    2) find 100 - 87=13
    3) multiply 17 and 13 which gives 221
    Thus you have got units place
    4) But here we have taken base as 100 which has two 0's so we will take 2 from 221 as carry over
    5) either subtract 83 - 13 or 87 - 7=80
    + carry over(2) =82
    So we have got the final answer 8221.

    Post Comments

    ravinder_amex
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    RavinderTue, 24 Nov 2009 12:21:03 -0000

    This was very interseting. Can you tell me how to do if number >100 needs to multiplied and so on?

    praby
    Rating
    2
    Rate Up
    Prabhjot SinghTue, 08 Dec 2009 22:30:46 -0000

    sorry to say .. but ans is 7221 and not 8221 :(
    these types of multiplications in which the 1st digit is common and the sum of the 2nd digits add to 10 can be done as:
    8*(8+1) and 3*7 giving 7221

    vishal_thacks
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    vishal bharat thakkarSat, 09 Jan 2010 04:49:46 -0000

    hey its 87-17 & not 7 , & d method is goood….

    Raj_jja
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Raj_jjaSat, 23 Mar 2013 05:29:09 -0000

    sorry but try it

    your method is wrong
    83 * 87 = 7221 not 8221

    i have another short method to solve it faster then u

    Reply to This
    porqpine
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Munish kumarSat, 21 Nov 2009 17:01:00 -0000

    1.30 mins.now please tell me the trick

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    sudgreen
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    sudharshiniTue, 29 Dec 2009 12:33:55 -0000

    I took 10 mins

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    sachin
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    sachinFri, 08 Jan 2010 13:09:16 -0000

    it took 6 mins to solve the problem,pls tell the trick

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Rudramuni
    Vote
    Current Rating
    2
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    RudramuniSun, 21 Feb 2010 03:32:38 -0000

    Nitya_84sharma s answer is very simple

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    mehulp
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Mehul PathakMon, 01 Mar 2010 13:30:55 -0000

    zwitten(Gaurav), its take more than 5 min, so pls i eagerly wait for ur rpl, pls rpl fast

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    azar9092
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    azharuddinTue, 16 Mar 2010 18:09:20 -0000

    very nice to learn

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    mydreams16
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    ARVIND KUMARSat, 20 Mar 2010 05:02:49 -0000

    These methods are easy to understand & use in competetive examinations.
    thanks

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    gmk
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    garima Sat, 27 Mar 2010 17:52:23 -0000

    i took 10 min. Now tell me trick

    Post Comments

    zikra
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    zikraSun, 24 Jun 2012 14:49:34 -0000

    i really loved dis simple methd….

    Reply to This
    bhanujonwal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    bhanujonwalMon, 19 Apr 2010 11:41:57 -0000

    this is a very Simple Method to Solve these Questions:-
    25*78

    Post Comments

    shoaib_maths
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    shoaib uddin quadriWed, 21 Apr 2010 11:18:41 -0000
    (25*78)

    =u can write 25 is equal to (100/4)
    =(78/4)100
    =(19.5)
    100
    =1950
    shoiabquadri@gmail.com

    raj_rdg
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    rajdeep ghoshTue, 12 Jul 2011 08:23:32 -0000

    see u can do it so simply..shoaib urs idea is r8 too bt nothr simple technique is there… 25×78=1950

    5×8=40 so place unit digit 0 and make carry 4. also 2×7=14 nd nw criss cross multiplication will b applicable tat is (2×8)=1635=51 plus previously carried 4 added up to get 51+4=55 so place 5 in tens and carry 5 wich add with (2×7=)14 to get 19..so answer is 1950….. :)

    Reply to This
    jfbhkjhdfhdfh
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    jfbhkjhdfhdfhSun, 25 Apr 2010 06:24:22 -0000

    only one or two tricks are help full
    this is only complete waste of time

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    vaiju_
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    vaiju_Tue, 27 Apr 2010 11:48:55 -0000

    when we multiply any number by 99.for ex.89*99 unit digit subtract from 10 and ten digit number subtract from 9 and then write 89-1 u will get the answer.
    89

    • 99
      --
      8811

    Post Comments

    ravi_pant
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    ravi_pantThu, 10 Jun 2010 10:40:05 -0000

    can u explain it more clearly

    jitendrasingh76
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    jitendrasingh76Fri, 20 May 2011 04:06:16 -0000

    i hav a trik which is very simple for such kind of problems..look
    89*99=
    89 is far frm 100 =11
    99 is far frm 100=1
    11*1=11put on right sideof ur answer
    89-1=88 or 99-11=88
    so put 88 on left side of ur answer..and u will get..the ans..
    8811

    krazy 4 maths
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    krazy 4 mathsMon, 26 Dec 2011 02:47:44 -0000

    i don't understand abt the 11 to the right

    Reply to This
    Marc
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    MarcThu, 29 Apr 2010 04:36:04 -0000

    Hi,

    Can anyone help me with the calculation of greater than 100 by any 3 or 4 digit number? Also, try and put the calculations related to division as well…

    Post Comments

    learner142
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    learner142Sat, 29 Jan 2011 12:06:00 -0000

    u can check divisibilty rule .
    eg. if 674 is give and u have to check that it is divisible by any no. or not.
    divisibilty rule of 3 is plus all the digts.eg.6+7+4=17 . the anser is not divisible by 3 so the no. is also no divisble

    ankita gawde
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    ankita gawdeSat, 06 Aug 2011 11:07:28 -0000

    hey there is one more method….
    if u have a number xxx and you have to check its divisibility by 2,3,5 den this is the trick….
    if the number in the tens place of any number is divisible by 2 then that whole number will be divisible by 2.
    if the sum of all digits in a number is divisible by 3 then that whole number is divisible by 3.
    and if the number has a 0 or 5 in its tens place then that number is divisible by 5…

    Reply to This
    kamariya
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kamariyaSat, 08 May 2010 14:17:08 -0000

    if you want to speed up your calculations then do this:-
    (104)whole square then follow steps:--

    1)add 104+04= 108 last digit ko hamesha add karna

    2) 4 whole suare= 16

    3)ans is 10816

    Post Comments

    Kadiwala Dhruvi
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Kadiwala DhruviSun, 22 May 2011 08:29:18 -0000

    it is good but can you tell me the tricks regarding sqares of125 116 212 344 or any number which doesnt come in 100 to 109. i will highly obliged to u.

    Reply to This
    prksh55
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    prksh55Thu, 13 May 2010 17:56:06 -0000

    83*87=7221…….. 8*(8+1)+72… 3*7=21.. 7221…… but 2 limitations in using this trick.. 1) first digit of two numbers should be similar, 2) sum of second digits must be equal to 10

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    sehaj_taneja96
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    sehaj_taneja96Mon, 24 May 2010 17:45:22 -0000

    You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10, just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number. Practice it on paper first!

    To multiply any two digit number by 11:

    • For this example we will use 54.
    • Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4).
    • Notice the hole between them!
    • Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9)
    • Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. That's it! 11 × 54=594

    The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9, you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition. For example 11 × 57 … 5__7 … 5+7=12 … put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 … 11 × 57 = 627
    Practice it on paper first!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    sum41
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    sum41Sat, 29 May 2010 08:35:24 -0000

    can you send me more triks on mye mail

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    sauvikk
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    sauvikkSat, 29 May 2010 16:36:37 -0000

    EVERY thing IS good…..but if u want to gain complete knowledge on maths….just buy the core vedic math book of SHANKARACHARYA….u can hav everything u want…….

    Post Comments

    ronic
    Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    ronicSun, 30 May 2010 11:42:15 -0000

    wherer should i get this book give me the address
    i m inspried by ur tricks my id is ronicroi89@gmail.com (kanpur)sent me more tricks if u can i will highly obliged to u
    thanks

    Reply to This
    deeptiarora
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    deeptiaroraSun, 30 May 2010 14:40:53 -0000

    for some sake its coooooooooool .what so ever but still it does not solve the layman's problem.
    for every different problem.one has to remember different trick.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This

Your Comment

Avatar
Vote
Current Rating
0
Rate Up
Rate Down
Have an account? Log In

Textile is Enabled. View Reference.
Lead_arrow_side

Similar Questions

More Questions